**********************-CJC
10/09/2019
Not Classified By Court
Contract - Other Contract
Orange, California
Michelle Fisher
David Fisher
OMNI CONTRACTING
U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
American Contractors Indemnity Company
Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Rainstoppers Inc.
Bellisimo Tilr & Marble, Inc.
Suretec Indemnity Company
Bryan Jennings Cahill
the Western Surety Company
Glenn David Daunch
Elasto Life Coatings
El Valle Plastering, Inc.
First Class Glass, Inc.
Bremer, Whyte, Brown & O'Meara, LLP
Plumtree & Associates
Intelink Law Group, PC
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12499790.
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019
ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 11/27/2019
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019
CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 11/19/2019
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661974 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486653.
DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12499790.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019
[-] Read LessDocketANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY RAINSTOPPERS INC. ON 12/12/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1698092 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2019 10:54:46 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1695205 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 04:30:37 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2866594 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 01:17:03 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY OMNI CONTRACTING ON 12/04/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1695021 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2019 01:15:55 PM.
[-] Read LessDocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 11/13/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41033964 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2019 10:31:52 AM.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
[-] Read LessDocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
[-] Read LessDocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 10/09/2019.
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12636543 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12461042.
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FISHER, DAVID; FISHER, MICHELLE ON 10/09/2019
[-] Read LessDocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2846757 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2019 02:25:50 PM.
[-] Read Less