This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:22 (UTC).

DAVID COLLINS VS. BESNIK DODA

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 DAVID COLLINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BESNIK DODA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID COLLINS

Defendants

MADHULIKA DODA

BESNIK DODA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2014
  • PURSUANT TO CCP 1952 EXHIBITS HAVE BEEN DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED BY DODA, BESNIK ON 10/29/2013; Filing Party: DODA, BESNIK ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/10/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY COLLINS, DAVID ON 09/26/2013; Filing Party: COLLINS, DAVID ON 09/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY COLLINS, DAVID ON 09/19/2013; Filing Party: COLLINS, DAVID ON 09/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF - PERSONAL FILED BY DODA, BESNIK; DODA, MADHULIKA ON 09/19/2013; Filing Party: DODA, BESNIK; DODA, MADHULIKA ON 09/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 53.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11455993 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11279885.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DODA, BESNIK; DODA, MADHULIKA ON 09/12/2013; Filing Party: DODA, BESNIK; DODA, MADHULIKA ON 09/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254153.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY COLLINS, DAVID ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: COLLINS, DAVID ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less