This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 11:35:29 (UTC).

DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. VS. COUNTY OF ORANGE

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 DARYA RESTAURANT, INC filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF ORANGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darya Restaurant, Inc.

Defendants

California Department of Alcohol Beverage Control

County of Orange

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES HAWKINS APLC

Defendant Attorney

LEON J PAGE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729915.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729915.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2021 09:43:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2021 09:43:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/30/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/30/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021

STIPULATION - OTHER (JOINT - EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING) RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021.

STIPULATION - OTHER (JOINT - EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING) RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (ORDER GRANTING TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/03/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER (ORDER GRANTING TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/03/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (OR ORDER) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/08/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (OR ORDER) FILED BY COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 09/08/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 10/20/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 10/20/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/10/2021 03:02:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/10/2021 03:02:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (JCCP 5180) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (JCCP 5180) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (CORRECTED) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (CORRECTED) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SHERMAN; Department: CX105

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31089242 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2021 02:32:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (CORRECTED) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT (JCCP 5180) FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 11/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41267266 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2021 01:22:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/10/2021 03:02:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/17/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2021 09:43:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/12/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/12/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729915.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1860523 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2021 05:26:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 06/17/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DARYA RESTAURANT, INC. ON 06/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less