This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 05:48:21 (UTC).

DARRYL PARKER VS. SP CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 DARRYL PARKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SP CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darryl Parker

Defendants

SP Corporation

Valley View Village, LLC

Derek Chen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morse Mehrban

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2021.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2021

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 08/10/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 08/10/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41226837 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021 11:15:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketPARKER, DARRYL REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PARKER, DARRYL ON 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41187664 RECEIVED ON 04/29/2021 11:45:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORSE MEHRBAN