This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:32 (UTC).

DANNY NIX VS. YOONKU YOON

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DANNY NIX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOONKU YOON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANNY NIX

Defendant

YOONKU YOON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN M. HANNA, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

COMPLAINT FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928137 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752362.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928137 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752362.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 04/07/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 04/07/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 04/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3400695 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 01:35:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928137 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752362.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY NIX, DANNY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446756 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:39:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.