This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 03:42:33 (UTC).

DANIEL ROBERT JONES VS. THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 DANIEL ROBERT JONES filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Robert Jones

Defendants

Jeffrey T. Nahmias

Matthew O. Dolich

The Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Bruce G. Fagel & Associates

Defendant Attorney

Fraser Watson & Croutch LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038942 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866963.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038942 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866963.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/22/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/22/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866491.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866491.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 05/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 05/06/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 05/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 05/02/2022

STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE TRIAL ATTORNEY) FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE TRIAL ATTORNEY) FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21159236 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2022 03:45:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1988584 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2022 03:45:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31156789 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2022 03:45:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (RE TRIAL ATTORNEY) FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41331818 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2022 02:12:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31147545 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2022 03:50:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866491.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41325741 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2022 10:48:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13038942 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12866963.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JONES, DANIEL ROBERT ON 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 04/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant