This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:53 (UTC).

DANIEL GALDAMEZ VS. JUSTIN MICHAEL DAVIS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 DANIEL GALDAMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUSTIN MICHAEL DAVIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL GALDAMEZ

Defendant

JUSTIN MICHAEL DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN RAPILLO

Defendant Attorneys

GILSLEIDER, MCMAHON & MOLINELLI

LAW OFFICES OF GILSLEIDER, MCMAHON, MOLINELLI, & PHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 03/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 03/07/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927234 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751459.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927234 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751459.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953124 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777289.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953124 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777289.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 07/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 07/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/23/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/23/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 06/27/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 06/27/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 04/21/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 04/21/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 08/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 08/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11943155 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11767330.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11943155 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11767330.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 03/28/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/26/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2016 08:45:00 AM.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1369670 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2017 10:28:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2016 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS, JUSTIN MICHAEL ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3396462 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 03:50:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3388218 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016 09:52:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927234 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751459.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GALDAMEZ, DANIEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385074 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:37:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.