This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/07/2017 03:49:57

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Dale E Mcatee against Dennis Hildebrandt in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number **********************-HNB
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Dennis Hildebrandt
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Dale E. Mcatee
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION
  • 06/23/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/23/2016 08:30:00 AM.
  • 06/23/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
  • 06/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 06/23/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.
  • 06/02/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM.
  • 06/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2453038 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 12:40:15 PM.
  • 04/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY MCATEE, DALE E. ON 04/06/2016; Filing Party: MCATEE, DALE E. ON 04/06/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751414.
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446625 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:21:11 AM.
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MCATEE, DALE E. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCATEE, DALE E. ON 02/26/2016

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.