This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 22:57:10 (UTC).

DAAD MAKHLOUF VS. HOLLIDAY ROCK CO. INC

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 DAAD MAKHLOUF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOLLIDAY ROCK CO INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAAD MAKHLOUF

Defendant

HOLLIDAY ROCK CO. INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 01/25/2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT VCC5/C19 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/07/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/07/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 12/07/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/10/2022 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 12/07/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 11/03/2022; Filing Party: MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD REJECTED ON 10/19/2022.; Filing Party: SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD REJECTED ON 10/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER (SERVICE COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/10/2022 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/15/2022 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 11/10/2022 AT 08:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMAKHLOUF, DAAD ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 07/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMAKHLOUF, DAAD REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 07/28/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/15/2022 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 07/28/2022; Filing Party: MAK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 07/28/2022; Filing Party: MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 07/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 07/28/2022; Filing Party: MAKHLOUF, DAAD ON 07/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLIDAY ROCK COMPANY INC. ERRONEOSLY SU is a litigant