This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:15 (UTC).

D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. VS. SILLAGE, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 D K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SILLAGE, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC.

Defendants

SILLAGE, LLC

SELINA HASSID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SUNIL A. BRAHMBHATT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 03/14/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 03/14/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4663222 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4663222 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947122.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947122.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1344417 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1344417 REJECTED.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/14/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4660474 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4660474 REJECTED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 12/22/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 12/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939321.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939321.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 04/22/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 04/22/2016

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 04/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 03/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947122.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3521675 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2017 12:46:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2537174 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12115515 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11939321.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 3/2/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4686426 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2017 10:08:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 04/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537199 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2016 01:47:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 04/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2455140 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2016 12:03:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927573 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751798.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY D & K PRINTING AND GRAPHICS, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509512 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:13:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.