This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 12:25:36 (UTC).

CYNTHIA SABRINA CHIDESTER VS. AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 CYNTHIA SABRINA CHIDESTER filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against AMERICA'S WHOLESALE LENDER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cynthia Sabrina Chidester

Nita Chidester

Defendants

Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.

America's Wholesale Lender

Quality Loan Service Corporation

The Bank of New York Mellon

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.

Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Imperiale Law Group

Safarian Choi & Bolstad, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Akerman LLP

McGuireWoods LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 12/02/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 12/02/2021 01:30:00 PM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/30/2021

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/30/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/29/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/29/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/17/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794682.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12966759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12794682.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/04/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/04/2021

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/03/2021

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12964004 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791927.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12964004 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791927.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/29/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/29/2021

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2021

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/28/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12958975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12786872.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12958975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12786872.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 10/19/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 10/19/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/15/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/15/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/04/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 10/04/2021

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 12/02/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21094543 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2021 04:59:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31091229 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2021 05:13:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31090064 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021 10:39:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.; THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA; CHIDESTER, NITA ON 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1777619 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020 09:58:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA ON 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12775460 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12602132.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 09/01/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA; CHIDESTER, NITA ON 09/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA; CHIDESTER, NITA ON 09/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHIDESTER, CYNTHIA SABRINA; CHIDESTER, NITA ON 09/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Americas Wholesale Lender is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant