This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 14:46:23 (UTC).

CROUSE - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 CROUSE - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

ZOE B CROUSE

Administrator

ROBYN S FARBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

SUSAN A KATZEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: (P) REVIEW HEARING; Department: C08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION 12/15/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketROBYN S FARBER APPOINTED AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ZOE BEYLA CROUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY ROBYN S. FARBER IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.; Filing Party: ROBYN S. FARBER IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docket(P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/19/2023 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21097901 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2021 04:37:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENT FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/08/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1925551 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 11:52:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/06/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/06/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21087592 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2021 09:35:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 11/10/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 11/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(P) PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/2021 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 201 - FIRST PAPERS-OTHER PROBATE: PETITION COMMENCING OTHER PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE PROBATE CODE AND OBJECTIONS OR OTHER OPPOSITION TO SUCH PETITIONS, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDING IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12956839 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12784736.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21076712 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2021 04:47:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENT TO DUTIES FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED BY FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021; Filing Party: FARBER, ROBYN S ON 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZEN, SUSAN A