This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 12:08:30 (UTC).

CRINISOR STEFAN VS. J.P. MORGAN CHASE CO.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 CRINISOR STEFAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J P MORGAN CHASE CO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRINISOR STEFAN

Defendants

QANTAS AIRWAYS LIMITED

J.P. MORGAN CHASE CO.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/09/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 10/14/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/28/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/28/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773218.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/09/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021; Filing Party: STEFAN, CRINISOR ON 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Qntas Airways Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant