This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 10:28:38 (UTC).

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. VS. CREST INVESTMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 CRENSHAW LUMBER CO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CREST INVESTMENT LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crenshaw Lumber Co.

Defendants

George Hajj

Crest Investment LLC

Dexore Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paris and Paris, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662474.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41213863 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2021 02:34:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41213861 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2021 02:32:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1855221 RECEIVED ON 06/04/2021 01:14:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31023595 RECEIVED ON 06/04/2021 01:12:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41193932 RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021 03:03:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41193930 RECEIVED ON 05/14/2021 03:02:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12835071 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12662474.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3973228 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2021 04:46:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 01/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crest Investment LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant