This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:48:03 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS. ON-THE-GO DELIVERY SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ON-THE-GO DELIVERY SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.

Defendant

On-The-Go Delivery Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Kenneth J. Freed

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/25/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/09/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/09/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737081.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737081.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41232980 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 02:32:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31048551 RECEIVED ON 08/09/2021 04:44:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12909222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12737081.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41213063 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2021 10:04:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 07/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant