This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 12:44:01 (UTC).

CQE, LLC VS. LUMEXIS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/08/2016 CQE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUMEXIS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CQE, LLC

Defendant

LUMEXIS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4681477 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4681477 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12102757 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11926696.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12102757 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11926696.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 02/06/17) RECEIVED ON 02/01/2017.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 02/06/17) RECEIVED ON 02/01/2017.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2524775 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2524775 REJECTED.

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/13/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/09/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/09/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017.

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/06/2017

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/06/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/06/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 01/06/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 11/08/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 11/08/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3472555 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3472555 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/29/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 09/08/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 09/08/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12027068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11851068.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12027068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11851068.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4681477 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12102757 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11926696.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 02/06/17) RECEIVED ON 02/01/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4671391 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2017 11:39:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2524775 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3472555 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3463017 RECEIVED ON 09/29/2016 12:18:12 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 09/08/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12027068 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11851068.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CQE, LLC ON 09/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1342249 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2016 02:36:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CQE INC. is a litigant