This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:24:52 (UTC).

COWAN - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 COWAN - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

KEITH COWAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 02/23/2018; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 02/23/2018; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3638674 RECEIVED ON 02/21/2018 12:09:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE RECEIVED ON 02/21/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP RECEIVED ON 02/21/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • REPORT OF FIREARM PROHIBITION/RELEASE FILED AND COPY SENT TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/20/2017; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING 12/20/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • PUBLIC GUARDIAN APPOINTED AS CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE OF KEITH COWAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING 12/13/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1429355 RECEIVED ON 10/11/2017 09:29:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/11/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • APPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428852 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 08:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • TEMPORARY LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.