This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:29:06 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ORANGE VS JONATHAN OPP

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 COUNTY OF ORANGE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JONATHAN OPP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1486

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Defendant

OPP, JONATHAN R

Not Classified By Court

OPP, KARISSA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DCSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT; Department: L54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 08/26/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT; Department: L54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 08/07/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION - JUDGMENT 08/03/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION 07/28/2020; Filing Party: JONATHAN, OPP ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/24/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/24/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 07/01/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less