This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:24:09 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ORANGE VS DEVON MEDINA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 COUNTY OF ORANGE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against DEVON MEDINA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1507

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Defendant

MEDINA, DEVON LEE

Not Classified By Court

URIBE, ILIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DCSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT - STIPULATION - PARENTAGE & SUPPORT 08/25/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT - STIPULATED 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/23/2020; Filing Party: MEDINA, DEVON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - COURT CHILD SUPPORT UNIT 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 07/01/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less