This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:25:25 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ORANGE VS ALEXANDER SILVESTRE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 COUNTY OF ORANGE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ALEXANDER SILVESTRE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1502

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Defendant

SILVESTRE, ALEXANDER

Not Classified By Court

MANCIA, SAMANTHA Y

MANCIA, SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DCSS

Defendant Attorney

FEIG LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT; Department: L51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 08/13/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION - JUDGMENT 08/06/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/31/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketANSWER - COMPLAINT RE PARENTAL OBLIGATION 07/30/2020; Filing Party: SILVESTRE, ALEXANDER BUTCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PARENTAL OBLIGATION 07/01/2020; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less