This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:54 (UTC).

COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS VS. NOEMI VILLANUEVA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NOEMI VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS

Defendants

ANTONIO LOPEZ MEJIA

NOEMI VILLANUEVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758774.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758774.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927060 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751285.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927060 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751285.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/29/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/29/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758774.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/11/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3389911 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016 01:29:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927060 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751285.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY COUNTRY SQUIRE APARTMENTS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306905 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:54:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.