This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/28/2017 at 20:35:20 (UTC).

CORTEZ-MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 CORTEZ-MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIA CORTEZ

Minor

OSVALDO ZAVALETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRY J KIM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2014
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 02/21/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • BLOCKED ACCOUNT CREATED FOR ZAVALETA,OSVALDO ON 02/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1147891 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2014 04:31:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • RECEIPT - OTHER (RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO THE BLOCKED ACCOUNT) FILED BY CORTEZ, MARIA ON 02/13/2014; Filing Party: CORTEZ, MARIA ON 02/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CONTINUED TO 02/21/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 01/24/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/15/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CONTINUED TO 01/24/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • (P) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2013
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINORS CLAIM FILED BY CORTEZ, MARIA ON 09/20/2013; Filing Party: CORTEZ, MARIA ON 09/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR 09/20/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FILED BY MARIA CORTEZ IS APPROVED PER ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; Filing Party: MARIA CORTEZ IS APPROVED PER ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 349789 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2013 01:06:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • ORDER - OTHER (COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION) RECEIVED ON 08/15/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • (P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR SCHEDULED FOR 09/20/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11432604 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11256476.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462644 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:51:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FILED BY CORTEZ, MARIA ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: CORTEZ, MARIA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less