This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:10 (UTC).

CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. VS. ABDULLAH MOJEDIDI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ABDULLAH MOJEDIDI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P.

Defendant

ABDULLAH MOJEDIDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD A. BRISCO & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751780.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751780.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 06/08/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 06/08/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 06/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 04/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2458668 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016 12:05:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 03/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2450586 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016 04:59:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927555 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751780.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CORONADO SOUTH APARTMENTS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307134 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:43:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less