This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 03:40:13 (UTC).

CONSTRUCTURE, INC. VS. 2525 MAIN APARTMENT, L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 CONSTRUCTURE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 2525 MAIN APARTMENT, L P. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Constructure, Inc.

Defendants

2525 Main Apartment, L.P.

A & R Corporation, Inc.

Hudson Insurance Company

Panku, Inc.

Shanghai Commercial Bank, Ltd.

Suretec Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pahl & McCay

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13042937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12870953.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13042937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12870953.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21148967 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 09:05:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13042937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12870953.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CONSTRUCTURE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 04/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHANGHAI COMMERCIAL BANK, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where PANKU, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where 2525 MAIN APARTMENT LP is a litigant

Latest cases where A & R CORPORATION INC. is a litigant