This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:17:53 (UTC).

CONCEPCION GONZALEZ-HUERTA VS FRANCISCO FRAGOSO-SI

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CONCEPCION GONZALEZ-HUERTA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANCISCO FRAGOSO-SI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8262

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

Respondent

FRAGOSO-SILVA, FRANCISCO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 02/06/2018; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 02/06/2018; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/18/2018 AMENDED; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 01/18/2018; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 12/08/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/08/2017 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 12/08/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 12/08/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/08/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GONZALEZ-HUERTA, CONCEPCION

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.