This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:41:13 (UTC).

COLONY SPECIALTY VS. JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 COLONY SPECIALTY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLONY SPECIALTY

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Landworks Construction

JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC

Crenshaw Lumber Company

Other and Defendant

JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orland Law Group

Other and Defendant Attorneys

Gray Duffy, LLP

Collins + Collins LLP

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Collins + Collins LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 11/29/2021 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 11/29/2021 10:30:00 AM.

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 12/01/2021

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 12/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12971786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12799703.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12971786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12799703.

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 11/10/2021

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 11/10/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 11/10/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 11/10/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21019606 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21019606 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12935874 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12763782.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12935874 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12763782.

MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 08/24/2021

MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 08/24/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE MISC - NON COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 07/30/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE MISC - NON COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 07/30/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12888323 AND RECEIPT NUM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12888323 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12716102.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CRENSHAW LUMBER COMPANY ON 05/17/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2021

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12799312 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12626331.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12799312 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12626331.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY JD DEMOLITION AND GRADING INC ON 10/22/2020

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 11/29/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31092053 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 11:03:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT CONTINUED TO 01/10/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/2022 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketJOINDER SCHEDULED FOR 11/29/2021 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12971786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12799703.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2940542 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2020 09:44:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/25/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/24/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12584058.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2921695 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2020 12:23:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 07/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY COLONY SPECIALTY ON 07/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant