This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:16 (UTC).

COLMENARES - NAME CHANGE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 COLMENARES - NAME CHANGE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HUGO COLMENARES

ERICA ANTOLIN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA T. FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751640.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA T. FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751640.

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA; COLMENARES, HUGO ON 06/29/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA; COLMENARES, HUGO ON 06/29/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , ERICA FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11990849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11814938.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , ERICA FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11990849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11814938.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 04/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 04/01/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/29/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA; COLMENARES, HUGO ON 06/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY , ERICA FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11990849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11814938.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT D100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME CONTINUED TO 06/29/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ANTOLIN, ERICA T. FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751640.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY COLMENARES, HUGO; ANTOLIN, ERICA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less