This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:28:51 (UTC).

COLLETTE EMMA BEAUCHAMP VS. ABEL JUAREZ DOMINGO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 COLLETTE EMMA BEAUCHAMP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABEL JUAREZ DOMINGO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLETTE EMMA BEAUCHAMP

Defendant

ABEL JUAREZ DOMINGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD WEISS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 10/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 10/10/2017.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3605591 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3605591 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF VOIDED FILING AFTER DENIAL OF REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/01/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (OF VOIDED FILING AFTER DENIAL OF REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/01/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/12/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/12/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3605591 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF VOIDED FILING AFTER DENIAL OF REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT VOIDED ON 11/01/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL- NSF/FEE WAIVER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 10/12/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BEAUCHAMP, COLLETTE EMMA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1429205 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 03:57:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.