This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 02:07:13 (UTC).

COBRA ROUSHANZAMIR VS. DUGALLY OBERFLED, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 COBRA ROUSHANZAMIR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DUGALLY OBERFLED, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cobra Roushanzamir

Defendants and Others

Dugally Oberfled, Inc.

Crystal Cove Community Association

Trebor Shorning Rental

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vaziri Law Group, APC

Defendant and Other Attorney

Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12530122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12353881.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12530122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12353881.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 04/08/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 04/08/2019.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CRYSTAL COVE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/19/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CRYSTAL COVE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/19/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12574265 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12398282.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12574265 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12398282.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CRYSTAL COVE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/19/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CRYSTAL COVE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/19/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/10/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/10/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/24/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/24/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/25/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/25/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 08/14/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 08/14/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2826601 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2019 10:45:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 10/25/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1648288 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2019 03:35:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4994030 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019 01:18:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4965392 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2019 02:16:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 04/08/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12530122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12353881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • SURETY NOT IN GOOD STANDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ROUSHANZAMIR, COBRA ON 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2781499 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2019 09:32:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dugally Oberfeld, Inc. is a litigant