This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:29:42 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. RODNEY N. DECKER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODNEY N DECKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

RODNEY N. DECKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057902.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057902.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2018

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2694550 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2018 03:00:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2608962 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 03:43:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3603994 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 01:39:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234223 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057902.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601139 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 03:58:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.