This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:25:14 (UTC).

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. CLARA E. SERPAS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLARA E SERPAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

CLARA E. SERPAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP 1033) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP 1033) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 9/5/2018) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/28/2018

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 9/5/2018) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/28/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/19/2018

DOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPUTATION OF INTEREST) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

DOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPUTATION OF INTEREST) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12413116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12236827.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12413116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12236827.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/20/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/20/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2018 01:30:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON AUG. 20, 2018) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2018.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON AUG. 20, 2018) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2018.

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057858.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057858.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12413116 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12236827.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 9/5/2018) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4880974 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2018 10:20:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF 3553.73 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST SERPAS, CLARA E. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON AUG. 20, 2018) RECEIVED ON 08/06/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (COMPUTATION OF INTEREST) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: ATTORNEY FEES) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3679719 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2018 07:50:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1511124 RECEIVED ON 06/19/2018 03:22:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057858.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595897 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 02:51:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.