This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:06 (UTC).

CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION VS. MAURICE KARKAR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAURICE KARKAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHI

Defendant

MAURICE KARKAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 05/16/2016; Filing Party: CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016; Filing Party: CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 05/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751355.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CLAYTON THOMAS NOEL, DC, CHIROPRACTIC CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less