This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:50:54 (UTC).

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS. KELLIS COLLINS

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KELLIS COLLINS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Civic Financial Services, LLC

Defendants

Construction Loan Services, LLC

Kellis Collins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Summit Legal, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729728.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729728.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/16/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/16/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21038894 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2021 08:21:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 07/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41214086 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2021 08:21:13 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31028973 RECEIVED ON 06/18/2021 09:55:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729728.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1859681 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2021 11:29:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 06/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 06/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant