Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 08:47:24 (UTC).

CITY OF SANTA ANA VS. CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC

Case Summary

On 04/25/2018 CITY OF SANTA ANA filed an Other lawsuit against CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF SANTA ANA

Defendant

CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OFFICE OF CITY ATTORNEY

BEST BEST & KRIEGER LLP

Defendant Attorney

Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory & Natsis LLP

Other Attorneys

ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NA

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2019

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/11/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/11/2019

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/16/2019

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 01/16/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/11/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/11/2019 09:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 12/27/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 12/27/2018

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 11/14/2018

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 11/14/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 10/24/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 10/24/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 10/11/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 10/11/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12416644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12240335.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12416644 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12240335.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO FURTHER CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 09/11/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO FURTHER CONTINUE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 09/11/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/11/2018 08:48:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/11/2018 08:48:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/07/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4874207 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4874207 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 06/28/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 06/28/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 04/26/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 04/26/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 04/25/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 04/25/2018.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/19/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4991156 RECEIVED ON 07/16/2019 06:07:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC ON 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1644769 RECEIVED ON 07/16/2019 04:44:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/11/2019 04:36:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4860732 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2018 01:57:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/31/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 04/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3661068 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2018 10:22:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 04/25/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF SANTA ANA ON 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3660746 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2018 01:47:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC is a litigant