This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 05:33:26 (UTC).

CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY VS. CHRISTOPHER LARY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2016 CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER LARY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY

Defendants

TIMOTHY LARY

CHRISTOPHER LARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL W MIHELICH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LARY, TIMOTHY ON 05/11/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LARY, TIMOTHY ON 05/11/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/12/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/12/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/24/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/13/2016

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/13/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/14/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/14/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 6/16/16) RECEIVED ON 06/14/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 6/16/16) RECEIVED ON 06/14/2016.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 07/05/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 07/05/2016

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 07/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED ON 6/16/16) RECEIVED ON 06/14/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/14/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4561946 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2016 03:40:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 06/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketPOSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY: 1750 W. LAMBERT ROAD, SPACE 91, LA HABRA, CA 90631 IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4552204 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2016 02:09:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketLARY, TIMOTHY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/12/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LARY, TIMOTHY ON 05/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LARY, TIMOTHY ON 05/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LA HABRA HOUSING AUTHORITY ON 05/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1320627 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2016 01:53:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIHELICH, MICHAEL W