This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2017 at 07:43:49 (UTC).

CINDI WILLIS VS. CITY OF MISSION VIEJO

Case Summary

On 03/04/2013 CINDI WILLIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF MISSION VIEJO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDI WILLIS

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

CITY OF MISSION VIEJO

RAZI LAW GROUP

ALISO VILLAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION #2

ACCELL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

SADDLEBACK RANCH APARTMENTS

AMBER PROPERTY MANAGMENT

ALISO VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

SOFTSCAPES THE ART OF LANDSCAPING

SOFTSCAPE THE ART OF LANDSCAPE CO.

THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD, LLC

FAB ENTERPRISES

SOFTSCAPES THE ART OF LANDSCAPE

TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY

ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

AMBER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

ALISO VILLAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN, A PROFESSIONAL LAW

RAZI LAW GROUP

RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RAZI LAW GROUP

LAW OFFICES OF BARBER & BAUERMEISTER

MACRAE & EDRINGTON

PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

CLINTON & CLINTON

WILLIS DEPASQUALE, LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARBER & BAUERMEISTER

PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE

MICHAEL MAGUIRE & ASSOCIATES

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

CLINTON & CLINTON

WILLIS DEPASQUALE, LLP

MACRAE & EDRINGTON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES; TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 01/09/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES; TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 01/09/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/09/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/09/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11685711 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11509953.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11685711 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11509953.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3152770 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3152770 REJECTED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES; TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2014

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES; TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 11) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/14/2014

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 11) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/14/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/06/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/06/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/16/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/16/2013 09:00:00 AM.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD, LLC ON 09/12/2013

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE BRICKMAN GROUP LTD, LLC ON 09/12/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCELL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ON 07/11/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ACCELL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ON 07/11/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES ON 07/03/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES ON 07/03/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MOTION OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY ALISO VILLAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION #2 ON 06/20/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MOTION OFF CALENDAR) FILED BY ALISO VILLAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION #2 ON 06/20/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11384372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11208264.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11384372 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11208264.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/30/2013 04:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/30/2013 04:43:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11380906 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11204798.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11380906 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11204798.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY CITY OF MISSION VIEJO ON 04/09/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY CITY OF MISSION VIEJO ON 04/09/2013

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/18/2013

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/18/2013

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/11/2013

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/11/2013

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3243099 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2015 04:22:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3242849 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4308189 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY FAB ENTERPRISES; TRIUMPH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 01/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 01/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1218785 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2015 10:32:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
279 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2221415 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2013 08:13:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2220212 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2013 10:09:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 03/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11327775 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11151667.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WILLIS, CINDI ON 03/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 162509 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2013 02:34:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Brickman Group Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE PAMELA ABBOTT