This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 03:48:28 (UTC).

CIG FINANCIAL, LLC VS. GUADALUPE ARZOLA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 03/15/2023 CIG FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GUADALUPE ARZOLA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIG Financial, LLC

Defendant

Guadalupe Arzola Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CIG Financial, LLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/15/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/15/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13193131 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13021257.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13193131 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13021257.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/16/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/16/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/22/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2023

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/17/2023.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/17/2023.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31312029 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2023 11:31:43 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/17/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41480061 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2023 11:59:19 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11117794 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2023 01:48:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11114919 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2023 09:44:42 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13193131 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13021257.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11114266 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2023 09:02:08 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CIG FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less