This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/16/2017 at 05:01:05 (UTC).

CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC. VS. HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO , INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HABERBUSH ASSOCIATES, LLP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.

OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY

Defendants and Others

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP

DAVID R. HABERBUSH

VANESSA M. HABERBUSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

PREOVOLOS, LEWIN & HEZLEP, ALC

Defendant and Other Attorney

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/08/2017 08:25:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/08/2017 08:25:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HABERBUSH, DAVID R.; HABERBUSH, VANESSA M.; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 06/06/2017

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HABERBUSH, DAVID R.; HABERBUSH, VANESSA M.; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 06/06/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/01/2017 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

OBJECTION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

OBJECTION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/24/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/18/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HABERBUSH, VANESSA M.; HABERBUSH, DAVID R.; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/02/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HABERBUSH, VANESSA M.; HABERBUSH, DAVID R.; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 05/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/01/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/01/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/01/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 05/01/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/25/2017 11:35:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/25/2017 11:35:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12144465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11968265.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 495.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12144465 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11968265.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 04/19/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC.; OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY ON 04/19/2017

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/08/2017 08:25:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 07/13/2017 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT CONTINUED TO 07/13/2017 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT CONTINUED TO 07/13/2017 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS-COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HABERBUSH, DAVID R.; HABERBUSH, VANESSA M.; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP; HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 06/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1389111 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2017 02:18:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4424870 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC. ON 07/23/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3312149 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2015 11:20:46 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 07/22/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11820545 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11644834.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC. ON 07/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC. ON 07/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CIAJ DAVIS LAND AND CATTLE CO., INC. ON 07/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4410382 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2015 06:43:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HABERBUSH LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where OGGI'S PIZZA & BREWING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant