This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 06:51:09 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER YATES VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 CHRISTOPHER YATES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Yates

Defendants

OHL USA, Inc

Astaldi Construction Corporation

City of Fountain Valley

State of California

Kevin Nghe

All American Asphalt

OC 405 Partners JV

Myers & Sons Construction, LLC

California Department of Transportation

Orange County Transportation Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

The Simon Law Group, LLP

Beljajev Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2020

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/29/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/29/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/03/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/03/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 01/17/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 01/17/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12695027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12520046.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12695027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12520046.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MELZER; Department: C12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1720004 RECEIVED ON 02/13/2020 02:14:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41065826 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2020 03:20:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41062235 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2020 04:23:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1715115 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2020 11:28:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41060331 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2020 11:01:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12695027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12520046.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3878400 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2020 04:00:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 01/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY YATES, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASTALDI CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MYERS & SONS ? GRIFFITH A JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where OHL USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL AMERICAN ASPHALT is a litigant