This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 11:59:27 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER WOODSON VS. MARK SNYDER

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 CHRISTOPHER WOODSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARK SNYDER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER WOODSON

Defendants

KIMBERLY SNYDER

MARK SNYDER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792278.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792278.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

WRIT (OF POSSESSION) SUBMITTED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER REJECTED ON 06/10/2016.

WRIT (OF POSSESSION) SUBMITTED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER REJECTED ON 06/10/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, KIMBERLY A FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11984703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11808788.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, KIMBERLY A FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11984703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11808788.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/01/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/01/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, KIMBERLY A FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11984703 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11808788.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (OF POSSESSION) SUBMITTED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER REJECTED ON 06/10/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 06/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketDRAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11968122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11792278.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WOODSON, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less