This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 03:42:19 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER SIMS VS. TROY ROYCE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2016 CHRISTOPHER SIMS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TROY ROYCE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER SIMS

Defendant

TROY ROYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J. KLOSK

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KERMIT D. MARSH

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934401 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758586.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934401 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758586.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/15/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/15/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/15/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/16/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/22/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/22/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/25/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/25/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/19/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/19/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/20/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/20/2016 09:00:00 AM.

JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/20/2016

JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/20/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (PURSUANT TO STIPULATION) FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/20/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 04/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4535341 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2016 03:09:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1312688 RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016 02:10:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • ROYCE, TROY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/15/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROYCE, TROY ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11934401 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11758586.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMS, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1309200 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2016 12:40:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less