This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 06:15:51 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER GRIFFIN VS. LEGACY PARTNERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 CHRISTOPHER GRIFFIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEGACY PARTNERS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christopher Griffin

Christy Griffin

Rita Griffin

Rosemary Griffin

Defendants

Caribbean Cove Apartments, Inc.

Legacy Partners, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strongin | Burger, LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085061 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913051.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085061 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913051.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 10/14/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 10/14/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13121690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12949754.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13121690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12949754.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13121690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12949754.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21222173 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2022 08:56:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41367353 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2022 03:45:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY ON 08/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21191757 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2022 03:45:20 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13085061 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12913051.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31187666 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2022 04:45:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 07/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GRIFFIN, CHRISTOPHER; GRIFFIN, ROSEMARY; GRIFFIN, RITA; GRIFFIN, CHRISTY ON 07/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less