This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 05:48:50 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER ALLEN VS. WL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 CHRISTOPHER ALLEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NICHOLAS BERNATOWICZ

KAREN QUINN

ZORAN WEST

MILENA WEST

REGAN DAYOAN

MARIANNA NAGATO

KAREN HANSEN

JEFFREY LAYLAND

CHRISTOPHER ALLEN

INGRID SNOW

JENNIFER DAYOAN

DAVID DELGADO

MARVIN QUINN

ALLISON LAYLAND

AMIE PETERSON

Defendant and Other

WL HOMES LLC

Cross Defendants

ROYAL INDUSTRIES INC

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC

CONTRACT CARPET CORP

FORD PLASTERING INC

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM, & GAROFALO

MARTUCCI & ASSCOCIATES

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE

Wolfe & Wyman LLP

Other Attorneys

Skebba, Isaac & Buechler

Santa Cruz, Brownwood & Cannon

Law Offices Of John A. Hauser

Bohm Wildish & Matsen, LLP

Kulova, Armijo & Garcia

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/07/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/07/2019.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/31/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/30/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/30/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/30/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/30/2019.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/24/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/24/2019

ORDER GRANTING (ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF WL HOMES, LLC DBA JOHN LAING HOMES RE: ITS SETTLEMENT WITH CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION DBA RESIDENTIAL WALL SYSTEMS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) FILED BY WL HOME

ORDER GRANTING (ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF WL HOMES, LLC DBA JOHN LAING HOMES RE: ITS SETTLEMENT WITH CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION DBA RESIDENTIAL WALL SYSTEMS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/23/2019

ORDER GRANTING (ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF WL HOMES, LLC DBA JOHN LAING HOMES RE: ITS SETTLEMENT WITH DAVEY ROOFING INC) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/23/2019

ORDER GRANTING (ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF WL HOMES, LLC DBA JOHN LAING HOMES RE: ITS SETTLEMENT WITH DAVEY ROOFING INC) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/23/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985064 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985064 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985063 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4985063 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/10/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/10/2019

134 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3820965 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2019 10:37:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4997414 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019 09:29:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4817562 RECEIVED ON 02/21/2018 11:06:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAYLAND, ALLISON; ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER; DELGADO, DAVID; SNOW, INGRID; LAYLAND, JEFFREY; DAYOAN, JENNIFER; HANSEN, KAREN; QUINN, KAREN; NAGATO, MARIANNA; QUINN, MARVIN;OTHERS ON 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3618604 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2017 02:16:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 11/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12250755 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12074481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER; BERNATOWICZ, NICHOLAS; DAYOAN, REGAN; DAYOAN, JENNIFER; DELGADO, DAVID; HANSEN, KAREN; LAYLAND, JEFFREY; LAYLAND, ALLISON; NAGATO, MARIANNA; QUINN, MARVIN;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER; BERNATOWICZ, NICHOLAS; DAYOAN, REGAN; DAYOAN, JENNIFER; DELGADO, DAVID; HANSEN, KAREN; LAYLAND, JEFFREY; LAYLAND, ALLISON; NAGATO, MARIANNA; QUINN, MARVIN;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER; BERNATOWICZ, NICHOLAS; DAYOAN, REGAN; DAYOAN, JENNIFER; DELGADO, DAVID; HANSEN, KAREN; LAYLAND, JEFFREY; LAYLAND, ALLISON; NAGATO, MARIANNA; QUINN, MARVIN;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1438809 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017 11:09:19 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD PLASTERING is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WL HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATION INC. is a litigant