This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:16 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER VS. ERICA SORENSEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ERICA SORENSEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER

KELSEY FARRER

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST

ERICA SORENSEN

SKYLAR HOEY

STEVEN FISCHER

STEVEN SORENSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MIRHOSSEINI & ASSOCIATES

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

LAW OFFICES OF NANCY A HALAS

ROBINSON CALCAGNIE, INC.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/11/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/11/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 08/02/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 08/02/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 10/18/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 10/18/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3484804 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3484804 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12154513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11978241.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12154513 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11978241.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/07/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 07/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 08/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 08/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 08/11/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 08/11/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 01/26/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 01/26/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 09/02/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 09/02/2016

REFUND REQUEST SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT STEVEN FISCHER - DENIED

REFUND REQUEST SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT STEVEN FISCHER - DENIED

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 10/06/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 10/06/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 04/13/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 04/13/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/22/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 09/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 09/08/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/01/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STEVEN FISCHER 2004 LIVING TRUST ON 07/01/2016

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4835184 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2018 11:12:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 04/02/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SORENSEN, ERICA ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1483722 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018 12:24:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2654635 RECEIVED ON 03/27/2018 03:27:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3594856 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3418411 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2016 02:08:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752477.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALEXANDER, CHRISTOPHER ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307114 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:06:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.