This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 17:27:00 (UTC).

CHRISTINA TEHRANI VS. PARK NEWPORT LAND, LTD., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 CHRISTINA TEHRANI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PARK NEWPORT LAND, LTD , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Tehrani

Defendants

Park Newport Apartments

Park Newport LP

Park Newport Land, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Downtown LA Law Group

Defendant Attorney

Cornerstone Law Group

 

Court Documents

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/10/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/10/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2022 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 09/26/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 09/14/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 09/14/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 07/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 07/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899993.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071991 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899993.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 07/01/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LP ON 07/01/2022

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 06/17/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 06/17/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 06/28/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 06/28/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 04/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 04/19/2022

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: KNILL; Department: C17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: KNILL; Department: C17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketJURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 08/28/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketJURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 08/14/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 10/10/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41348270 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2022 11:48:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036985 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865006.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31146326 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 04:20:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 04/19/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TEHRANI, CHRISTINA ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less