This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 08:06:56 (UTC).

CHRISTIANNE LEHMAN VS. HERMINIA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 CHRISTIANNE LEHMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HERMINIA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Christianne Lehman

Elizabeth Freeman

Rosie Roe 1

Defendants

Emilio Gomez

Herminia Gomez

Rodrigo Gomez

Others and Defendants

Herminia Gomez

Rodrigo Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Joseph C. Rosenblit

Other and Defendant Attorneys

BWA LAW GROUP, APC

Wesierski & Zurek LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/11/2023

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13162112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12990209.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13162112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12990209.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ALL REQUESTS FOR PUNITIVE AND/OR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES) FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 01/03/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (AS TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AND ALL REQUESTS FOR PUNITIVE AND/OR EXEMPLARY DAMAGES) FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 01/03/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 12/14/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 12/14/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 11/21/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/31/2022 01:31:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/31/2022 01:31:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956838.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956838.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketGOMEZ, HERMINIA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED IN WHOLE ON 01/11/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13162112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12990209.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11085553 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023 03:54:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA ON 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, HERMINIA; GOMEZ, RODRIGO ON 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/31/2022 01:31:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 03/30/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 02/16/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13128773 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12956838.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21227426 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2022 02:41:46 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 10/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LEHMAN, CHRISTIANNE; FREEMAN, ELIZABETH ON 10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less