This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 12:23:00 (UTC).

CHRIS LANGER VS. CRAIG REALTY GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 CHRIS LANGER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CRAIG REALTY GROUP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Langer

Defendants

Mallfinder Network LLC

Craig Realty Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Center for Disability Access

Defendant Attorney

DAVID L. SANNER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836224 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663642.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836224 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663642.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 02/16/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 02/16/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 02/19/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 02/19/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 03/23/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 03/23/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/26/2021 02:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/26/2021 02:36:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 07/14/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 07/14/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY CRAIG REALTY GROUP; MALLFINDER NETWORK LLC ON 07/14/2021

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY CRAIG REALTY GROUP; MALLFINDER NETWORK LLC ON 07/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741437.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741437.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/19/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/19/2021 08:30:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/19/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2023 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913565 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741437.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41216709 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 03:48:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21041448 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021 02:44:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 02/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1812528 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2021 02:12:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 01/25/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12836224 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12663642.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LANGER, CHRIS ON 01/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2977503 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2021 02:55:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAIG REALTY GROUP is a litigant