This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/11/2022 at 04:35:37 (UTC).

CHRIS CORUM VS. CITY OF COSTA MESA

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 CHRIS CORUM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF COSTA MESA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Corum

Joni Corum

Defendants

City of Costa Mesa

City of Newport Beach

Edison International

Southern California Edison Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of David R. Greifinger

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13141039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12969133.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13141039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12969133.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/24/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/24/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/23/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31236860 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2022 03:22:15 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/24/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13141039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12969133.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31234413 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022 07:04:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 11/17/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CORUM, CHRIS; CORUM, JONI ON 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant