This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/23/2018 at 10:49:01 (UTC).

CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. VS. PCS LINK, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PCS LINK, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD.

Defendants

PCS LINK, INC.

JOHN ROBERT HALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHUMANN | ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT C WOODBURY

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12141587.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12141587.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 03/20/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 03/20/2018

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFF AT UPCOMING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 02/06/2018

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFF AT UPCOMING MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 02/06/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY HALL, JOHN ROBERT; PCS LINK, INC. ON 01/16/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY HALL, JOHN ROBERT; PCS LINK, INC. ON 01/16/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12281650 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12105391.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12281650 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12105391.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 01/12/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 01/12/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 10/02/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 10/02/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/26/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/25/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 09/25/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12013981.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12190281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12013981.

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM) FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 07/14/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM) FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 07/14/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/14/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/14/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 03/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 03/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/19/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 07/16/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS CONTINUED TO 04/23/2018 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/16/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12141587.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PCS LINK, INC. ON 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PCS LINK, INC. ON 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY PCS LINK, INC. ON 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 02/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 02/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3510713 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2017 11:40:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 01/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12089318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11913284.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 01/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 01/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHINA SAGE CONSULTANTS, LTD. ON 01/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4660606 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2017 12:04:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODBURY ROBERT