This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/24/2019 at 11:03:24 (UTC).

CHHAY V LI

Case Summary

On 04/11/2013 CHHAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3384

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rothana B. Chhay

Petitioner

CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

Defendant

Yan Li

Respondent

LI, YAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2013
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 12/09/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • JUDGMENT 12/09/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/09/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/09/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 12/09/2013 08:38:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 12/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 11/19/2013 14:51:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 08/22/2013 14:09:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/23/2013 13:32:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 04/11/2013 09:01:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 04/11/2013 09:28:00 F/W GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/11/2013 11:49:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • SUMMONS 04/11/2013 11:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 04/11/2013 11:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHHAY, ROTHANA BILL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.